Midroni, Gyl (CPSO#: 62364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Neurophysiology
9th floor, Donnelly wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5193
Fax: (416) 864-6095
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Midroni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Midroni ( CPSO# 62364 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Neurophysiology
9-Donnelly Wing, 9-502
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5193

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 21 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GYL MIDRONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIDRONI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991