Migay, Andrew Stanislaus (CPSO#: 79133)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 3251 35 Algoma St. North
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Phone: (807) 343-2431
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Migay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Migay ( CPSO# 79133 )

Business Address:
35 Algoma Street North
Box 3251
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Phone Number: (807) 343-2431

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW STANISLAUS MIGAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIGAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2003