Migay, Marcia Michelle (CPSO#: 81642)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
35 N. Algoma St.
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Phone: (807) 343-2431
Fax: (807) 343-0144
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcia Michelle Migay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Migay ( CPSO# 81642 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
Wound Department
35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 2N3
Phone Number: (807) 343-2431

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCIA MICHELLE MIGAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIGAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008