Milanska, Janina (CPSO#: 70418)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Gdansk, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 205
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone: (613) 737-5091
Fax: (613) 737-6048
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

TOH 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8899
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Milanska Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Milanska ( CPSO# 70418 )

Business Address:
Unit 205
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 737-3121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANINA MILANSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILANSKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001