Milencoff, Gregory Scott (CPSO#: 65356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Owen Sound Site
1800 8 th Street East
Suite 7210
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 371-2454
Fax: (519) 371-7208
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

340 High Street
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Canada
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Milencoff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Milencoff ( CPSO# 65356 )

Business Address:
Suite 7210
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 371-2454

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY SCOTT MILENCOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILENCOFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1993