Milkereit, Maike-Svenja (CPSO#: 95614)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Health Service
100 Marie Curie Private (Suite 300)
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Milkereit Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Milkereit ( CPSO# 95614 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Health Services
Suite 300
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAIKE-SVENJA MILKEREIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILKEREIT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 27 Aug 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013