Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Milkovic, Heather Jane (CPSO#: 56815)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Names: Lindsay-Miljkovic, Heather Jane (used until: 18 Oct 1987 )     Miljkovic, Heather Jane (used until: 08 Jul 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
20 Emma Street
Chatham ON  N7L 5K5
Phone: (519) 354-5290
Fax: (519) 354-9011
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milkovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Milkovic ( CPSO# 56815 )
Dr. Z. Milkovic ( CPSO# 62363 )

Business Address:
103 - 20 Emma Street
Chatham ON  N7L 5K5
Phone Number: (519) 354-5290

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER JANE MILKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1987