Milkovic, Joseph Steve (CPSO#: 74239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone: (289) 969-2150
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Milkovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Milkovic ( CPSO# 74239 )

Business Address:
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jul 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH STEVE MILKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 19 Aug 1999 to 15 Sep 1999
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 2004 to 30 Apr 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 May 2005 to 30 Apr 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 May 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2000