Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Miller, John Douglas (CPSO#: 56226)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health System
Department of Thoracic Surgery
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 520 8915
Fax: 905 525 1081
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Canada
Phone: 905 525 9140 Ext. 22833
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John D. Miller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Miller ( CPSO# 56226 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health System
Department of Thoracic Surgery
50 Charlton Avenue East
T2105A
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6126

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-1200

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DOUGLAS MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 5 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 19 Mar 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2000