Miller, Mark Allen (CPSO#: 62051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 May 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3755 Cote Ste Catherine
Montreal QC  H3T 1E2
Phone: (514) 340-8294
Fax: (514) 340-7546
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chemin de L'Orme
Marcy L'Etoile 69280
France
France
Phone: +33478875454
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 30 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ALLEN MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1990