Milosevic, Michael Frederick (CPSO#: 58590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2932
Fax: (416) 946-2227
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MF Milosevic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Milosevic ( CPSO# 58590 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-6513

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 19 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL FREDERICK MILOSEVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILOSEVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1988