Mimeault, Richard Edgar (CPSO#: 51206)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Medical Protective Associa
PO Box 8225, Station T
Ottawa ON  K1G 3H7
Phone: (613)725-9965 Ext. 270
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Mimeault Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mimeault ( CPSO# 51206 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
CCW 1667
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 739-6979

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD EDGAR MIMEAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIMEAULT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1988