Mirza, Nazneen Sultana (CPSO#: 83882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Chittagong, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 302
310 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2G 2L3
Phone: (519) 743-2142 Ext. 105
Fax: (519) 585-1756
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

139/141 FATHER DAVID BAUER DRIVE
Waterloo ON  N2L6N9
Canada
Phone: 519 783 2236
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nazneen Mirza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mirza ( CPSO# 83882 )

Business Address:
302 - 310 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2G 2L3
Phone Number: (519) 743-2142

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAZNEEN SULTANA MIRZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 02 Jan 2006 to 26 Mar 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 27 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2007