Miserachs Barba, Maria del Mar (CPSO#: 103037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Barcelona, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Gastroenterology
555 University Ave
8th Floor Black Wing
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-4972
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gonzalo Sapisochin Cantis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sapisochin Cantis ( CPSO# 102401)
Dr. M. Miserachs Barba ( CPSO# 103037)

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of General Surgery
585 University Avenue
11PMB 184
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-5230

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Maria del Mar Miserachs Barba may practise medicine only as required
                  by the  clinical  fellowship  program  in  paediatric gastroenterology in
                  which Dr. Miserachs Barba is enrolled in the  Department  of Paediatrics,
                  University of Toronto;

            2.    Dr. Miserachs Barba shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients  and  out-
                  patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                  department  where Dr. Miserachs Barba is properly practising medicine and
                  to which postgraduate  trainees  are regularly assigned by the department
                  as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

            3.    Dr. Miserachs Barba shall not charge a fee for medical services; and

            4.    The certificate expires on June 30, 2018.