Mitchell, Jessica Sara (CPSO#: 87772)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leicester, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maple Family Health Team
1036 Princess Street Unit D2
Kingston ON  K7L 1H2
Phone: (613) 531-5888
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jessica Mitchell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mitchell ( CPSO# 87772 )

Business Address:
Maple Family Health Team
Unit D2
1036 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H2
Phone Number: (613) 531-8888

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA SARA MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2007 to 07 Jan 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 08 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 07 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 08 May 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 22 Sep 2009 to 21 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2010