Mitchell, Sara Berman (CPSO#: 91693)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Avenue
room A455
Toronto, ON
M4N 3M5
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100 Ext. x89351
Fax: 416-480-5354
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sara Mitchell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mitchell ( CPSO# 91693 )

Business Address:
Suite A455
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARA BERMAN MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2015