Mithani, Sharin (CPSO#: 102093)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: Mahoon, Sharinbir (used until: 03 Feb 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1309 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7L3
Phone: 613-482-0118
Fax: 613-680-6420
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mithani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mithani ( CPSO# 102093)

Business Address:
Suite 4
2150 Robertson Road
Nepean ON  K2H 9S1
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARIN MITHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITHANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 14 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2015