Mitton, Gregory Donald (CPSO#: 45701)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
Department of Radiology
206 John Street
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Phone: (905) 774-7431 Ext. 1221
Fax: (905) 774-7914
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

DEPARTMENT OF DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING
HOSPITAL FOR SICK CHILDREN
555 UNIVERSITY AVENUE
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-6026
Fax: (416) 813-7591
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

West Haldimand General Hospital
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville
Ontario
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Canada
Phone: (905) 768-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY DONALD MITTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 1987 to 06 Mar 1987
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2004