Moazzam, Ambreen (CPSO#: 102206)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Ziauddin Medical University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thamesview Family Health Team
465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 1C5
Phone: (519) 354-5540
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moazzam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moazzam ( CPSO# 102206)

Business Address:
Thamesview Family Health Team
465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 354-5540

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMBREEN MOAZZAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOAZZAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Oct 2013 to 14 Jan 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2015