Mobilos, Sophia (CPSO#: 88350)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 501
294 Main Street
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Phone: (416) 698-8788
Fax: (416) 691-3641
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sophia Mobilos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mobilos ( CPSO# 88350 )

Business Address:
501 - 294 Main Street
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Phone Number: (416) 698-8788

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOPHIA MOBILOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOBILOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010