Moffat, Grant Stuart (CPSO#: 70275)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Surgical Associates
2207 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1X1
Phone: (905) 820-3633
Fax: (905) 820-3352
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1960 Appleby line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Canada
Phone: (905) 335-1888
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bard Moffat Woolfson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2017


Corporation Name: Grant Moffat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Moffat ( CPSO# 70275 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Surgical Associates
2207 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1X1
Phone Number: (905) 820-3633

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRANT STUART MOFFAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOFFAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2001