Moffatt, Susan Lindsay (CPSO#: 51223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Dec 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2332
Fax: (613) 549-1459
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moffatt Brison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Moffatt ( CPSO# 51223 )
Dr. R. Brison ( CPSO# 31153 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2332

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 28 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN LINDSAY MOFFATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOFFATT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1986