Mohajerani, Seyed-Alireza (CPSO#: 102800)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:KERMAN UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Welland General Hospital
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 732-6111 Ext. 33250
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahmed ( CPSO# 102753)
Dr. M. Al-Husari ( CPSO# 84859 )
Dr. L. Van Sittert ( CPSO# 77411 )
Dr. M. Luterman ( CPSO# 59109 )
Dr. M. Kopp ( CPSO# 61467 )
Dr. W. Oelofse ( CPSO# 82011 )
Dr. R. Setrak ( CPSO# 81883 )
Dr. D. James ( CPSO# 55701 )
Dr. P. Kapend ( CPSO# 96224 )
Dr. M. Senechal ( CPSO# 91005 )
Dr. S. Mohajerani ( CPSO# 102800)
Dr. A. Graystone ( CPSO# 94103 )
Dr. D. Heywood ( CPSO# 99423 )

Business Address:
Welland County General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 732-6111


Corporation Name: S.A. Mohajerani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mohajerani ( CPSO# 102800)

Business Address:
Welland General Hospital
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 732-6111

Business Address:
9 - 4646 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5S4
Phone Number: (416) 512-6407

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Iran
Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEYED-ALIREZA MOHAJERANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAJERANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2014