Mohamdee, Mohammed Nazerul Hassan (CPSO#: 23879)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Dublin, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Mohamdee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2011

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients can request a copy of their records at the clinic where they were treated. Dr. Mohamdee worked at the following Ottawa clinics: 1. Appletree Medical Clinics (14 locations) Main Office: 2573 Baseline Road Ottawa, ON K2H 7B3 Tel: 613- 482-0118 2. A1 Medical Clinics with 3 locations a) Access Medical Clinic: Unit 6 3098 Carling Avenue Ottawa, ON K2B 7K2 Tel: 613-596-9840 b) Strandherd Crossing Medical Centre: 3161 Strandherd Dr. Ottawa,ON K2J 5N1 Tel: 613-823-7766 c) Barrhaven Mall Medical Centre: Suite 1002 900 Greenbank Road Ottawa, ON K2J 1S8 Tel: 613- 825-0276
Instructions: Dr. Mohamdee does not have any medical charts.
Date Received: 16 Dec 2011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011