Mohammad, Waleed M M A (CPSO#: 78953)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Armed Forces Hospital Kuwait
Sabhan 35852
Kuwait
Phone: 96522571636
Fax: 96522571838
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The View, Gulf Street
View Clinic, 11th floor
Salmiya 20002
Kuwait
Kuwait
Phone: 96598755500
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Kuwait

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALEED M M A MOHAMMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PEAP - Resident - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009