Mohammadzadeh Yaghchi, Behrooz Hamid (CPSO#: 83174)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Azari, English, Farsi, Russian

Education:The Azerbaijan N.Narimanov Memorial Stat, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

115 Delhi St
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammadzadeh Yaghchi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Mohammadzadeh Yaghchi ( CPSO# 83174 )

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEHROOZ HAMID MOHAMMADZADEH YAGHCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMADZADEH YAGHCHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 11 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 12 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 19 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2007 to 19 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2008 to 19 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2009