Mohan, Naresh (CPSO#: 53394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Malvern Medical Centre
Suite 335
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone: (416) 724-7774
Fax: (416) 724-7752
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

GTA Endoscopy
Suite 920
305 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 3V4
Canada
Phone: (416) 321-3883
Fax: (416) 321-5162
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 104
305 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON M1B3V4
Scarborough ON  M1B3V4
Canada
Phone: 416-724-1460
Fax: 647-340-1460
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naresh Mohan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mohan ( CPSO# 53394 )

Business Address:
Malvern Medical Centre
Suite 335
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (416) 724-7774

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NARESH MOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Jul 1988
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1989