Mohsin, Afshan (CPSO#: 80260)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
headwaters health care hospital
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: (519) 941-5481
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rolling hlls specialsit clinic
suite 154
150 rolling hills drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Canada
Phone: (519) 941-7117 Ext. 2
Fax: (519) 941-5481
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AFSHAN MOHSIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHSIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 08 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Oct 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2008