Mojab, Hamid (CPSO#: 81091)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Shiraz University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 131
7163 Yonge Street
Thronhill
Toronto ON  L3T 0C6
Phone: (905) 597-0931
Fax: (905) 597-0951
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Medicine
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hamid Mojab Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mojab ( CPSO# 81091 )

Business Address:
131 - 7163 Yonge Street
Markham ON  L3T 0C6
Phone Number: (905) 597-0931

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Aug 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAMID MOJAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOJAB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Aug 2004
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2005