Molla Ghanbari, Hedieh (CPSO#: 96200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Ross University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University avenue
Room 429
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 6850
Fax: 416-981-3553
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hedieh Molla Ghanbari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Molla Ghanbari ( CPSO# 96200 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 429
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEDIEH MOLLA GHANBARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLLA GHANBARI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2014