Molnar, Frank Joseph (CPSO#: 64242)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Geriatric Assessment Unit
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 16486
Fax: (613) 761-5334
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Molnar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Molnar ( CPSO# 64242 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 719-6928

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 15 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANK JOSEPH MOLNAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOLNAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1992