Mondoux, Shawn (CPSO#: 95866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 9055212100
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shawn Mondoux Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mondoux ( CPSO# 95866 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Cancer Centre
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
West End Urgent Care Centre
690 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A4
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 22 Jul 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAWN MONDOUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONDOUX is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2014 to 20 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2016