Monge, Juan Carlos (CPSO#: 68658)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Costa Rica, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiology
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5462
Fax: (416) 864-5974
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2300 Yonge Street
Suite 906
Toronto ON  M4P 1E4
Canada
Phone: (647) 776-2500
Fax: (647) 260-0279
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JC Monge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Monge ( CPSO# 68658 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Queen Wing, Suite 6-050
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5462

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUAN CARLOS MONGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONGE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1997