Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Moore, Wendy Ann Louise (CPSO#: 68058)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Mar 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 3041
Fax: (416) 530-6076
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wendy A. L. Moore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Moore ( CPSO# 68058 )

Business Address:
Department of Psychiatry
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Suite G117 OPMH 5FL
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY ANN LOUISE MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2000