Moosavi, Homayoon (CPSO#: 87845)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Oct 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Shiraz University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
GRHC Kitchener Waterloo Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
835 King Street West P O Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2981
Fax: (519) 749-4296
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moosavi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2016


Corporation Name: Homayoon Moosavi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Moosavi ( CPSO# 87845 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital-Kitchener Waterloo Site
Department of Medical Imaging
P.O. Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Oct 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 Apr 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Apr 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Mar 2009 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Homayoon  Moosavi  may  practise  independently  in the area of Diagnostic
            Radiology only.