Moozar, Kouros (CPSO#: 73855)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: Latifpour Moozar, Kouros (used until: 17 Nov 2004 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Surgical Centre
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-4994
Fax: (905) 721-6623
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Moozar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Townsley ( CPSO# 73495 )
Dr. K. Moozar ( CPSO# 73855 )

Business Address:
Taunton Surgical Centre
2nd Floor, West Wing
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KOUROS MOOZAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOOZAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2006