Moran, Keith Wilson Valentine (CPSO#: 62621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
169 Hiram Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 1C2
Phone: (705) 646-1221
Fax: (705) 646-1271
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

169 Hiram Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 1C2
Canada
Phone: (705) 646-1221
Fax: (705) 646-1271
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Moran ( CPSO# 62621 )

Business Address:
169 Hiram Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2C1
Phone Number: (705) 646-1221

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEITH WILSON VALENTINE MORAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1992