Moran Mendoza, Angel Onofre (CPSO#: 87540)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Oct 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Autonoma de San Luis Potosi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queens University
Richardson House
102 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 548-1380
Fax: (613) 549-1459
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Onofre Moran Mendoza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moran Mendoza ( CPSO# 87540 )

Business Address:
Queen's University
Richardson House
Room 211
102 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone Number: (613) 548-1380

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 22 Oct 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2007
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 10 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Oct 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Angel Onofre Moran Mendoza may practise independently in respirology, only.