Moran, Patrick Bruce (CPSO#: 54427)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4125
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1355 Bank Street
Suite 502
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Canada
Phone: (613) 738-1584
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK BRUCE MORAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1986