Morawska-Jablonska, Joanna Maria (CPSO#: 54644)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Apr 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
37 Thorncliff Place
Nepean ON  K2H 6L5
Phone: (613) 596-1993
Fax: (613) 596-6764
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanna M. Morawska-Jablonska Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Morawska-Jablonska ( CPSO# 54644 )

Business Address:
37 Thorncliff Place
Nepean ON  K2H 6L5
Phone Number: (613) 596-1993

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNA MARIA MORAWSKA-JABLONSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAWSKA-JABLONSKA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1989