Morch, Sandra Ellen (CPSO#: 69298)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
396 St Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5P 3N3
Phone: (416) 928-9343
Fax: (416) 928-9368
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jason Baker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Morch ( CPSO# 69298 )
Dr. J. Baker ( CPSO# 69423 )

Business Address:
Loblaws on the Mezzanine
396 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5P 3N3
Phone Number: (416) 928-9343

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA ELLEN MORCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORCH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1997