Morel, Richard (CPSO#: 59962)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
4 Beechwood
Ottawa ON  K1L 8L9
Phone: (613) 741-7174
Fax: (613) 741-0176
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Building N111
258 Somme Road
Petawawa ON  K8H 2X3
Canada
Phone: 613 687 5511 Ext. 4600
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Canada
Phone: 613 945 1060
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard F. Morel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 26 2007


Corporation Name: Richard F. Morel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Morel ( CPSO# 59962 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
4 Beechwood Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1L 8L9
Phone Number: (613) 741-7174

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD MOREL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOREL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2008