Morell, Thomas Paul (CPSO#: 54072)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
13 Gore Street
Perth ON  K7H 2L7
Phone: (613) 264-1155
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Paul Morell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Morell ( CPSO# 54072 )

Business Address:
13 Gore Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2L7
Phone Number: (613) 264-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS PAUL MORELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1984 to 14 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1986