Morgan, Jane Ann (CPSO#: 66685)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jan 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202C
1685 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1X7
Phone: (905) 745-2237
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. A. Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Morgan ( CPSO# 66685 )

Business Address:
202C - 1685 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1X7
Phone Number: (905) 745-2237

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE ANN MORGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORGAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Jul 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Nov 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Dec 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1999