Morillo, Carlos Arturo (CPSO#: 64594)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 17 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC General Campus
Division of Cardiology
David Braley CVSRI C3 120
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-0271 Ext. 40311
Fax: (905) 297-3785
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carlos A. Morillo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Morillo ( CPSO# 64594 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Colombia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLOS ARTURO MORILLO may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF MEDICINE, DIVISION OF CARDIOLOGY, MCMASTER UNIVERSITY in which Dr. MORILLO holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. MORILLO may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. MORILLO no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. MORILLO no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. MORILLO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2002
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Feb 2006