Morrison, Allan Fairchild (CPSO#: 92284)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Jan 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham Kent Family Health Team
Blenheim Medical Centre
30 Chatham Street North
Blenheim ON  N0P 1A0
Phone: (519) 676-5592
Fax: (866) 539-6714
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Street West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 352-6400
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allan F. Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Morrison ( CPSO# 92284 )

Business Address:
Chatham Kent Family Health Team
Blenheim Medical Centre
30 Chatham Street North
Blenheim ON  N0P 1A0
Phone Number: (519) 676-5592

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jan 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Allan  Fairchild  Morrison  may  practise medicine independently in family
            medicine, only.