Morrison, Kimberley Anne (CPSO#: 66802)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit A, Suite C01
310 Bridge Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 0A4
Phone: (613) 354-2858
Fax: (613) 354-6495
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimberley Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Morrison ( CPSO# 66802 )

Business Address:
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2A4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Business Address:
310 Bridge Street West
Unit A C01
Napanee ON  K7R 0A4
Phone Number: (613) 354-2858

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY ANNE MORRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRISON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Aug 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1995