Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Morrison, Kristin Rebecca (CPSO#: 65528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kristin R. Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTIN REBECCA MORRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRISON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 17 Nov 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2010