Morrow, Robert James (CPSO#: 57637)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RJ Morrow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 13 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Medical Solutions Tel: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 28 Mar 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2017