Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Morsi, Amr Ahmed (CPSO#: 68132)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amr Ahmed Morsi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Dhssraj Singh Windsor Heart Group Windsor Professional Centre Suite 201 2464 Howard Avenue Windsor ON N8X 3V6 Tel: 519-977-6643
Date Received: 04 Jan 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 14 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Dec 2016